judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIRBY M. LEARY, LICENSEE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-10-0187)
Case Number:S-10-0187Case Docketed On:09/07/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Washakie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:KIRBY M. LEARY, LICENSEE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:KIRBY M. LEARY, LICENSEE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKirby M. LearyDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/07/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/07/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/25/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appellant's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/25/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/04/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
11/18/2010Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellant indicating that she will deliver original motion to dismiss tomorrow.EventPhone CallFinal
11/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss (Waiver electronically filed, but not attached)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/19/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/19/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal