judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DEON ANTHONY THOMAS V. SHAMEEKA R. PANNELL

Case Information: 11-FM-0577
Short Caption:DEON ANTHONY THOMAS V. SHAMEEKA R. PANNELLClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PCS247-11Filed Date:05/06/2011

Opening Event Date:05/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/02/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/24/2012
Argued/Submitted:11/30/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/18/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDeon Anthony Thomas YPro SeN
AppelleeShameeka R. Pannell NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 14, 2011, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
05/26/2011RECEIVED- aplt's motion for appeal transcript 3/14/11 1/19/11 2/3/11 1/5/11 (rt. needed)
06/15/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED Deon Anthony Thomas
07/25/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (18 pgs/tape) 3/14/11 proc.
08/02/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/02/2011FiledRecord Index
08/02/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/23/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/12/2011FiledOrder directing appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days
10/27/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)Granted
11/10/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Denied
11/10/2011LodgedBrief (supplemental) (pro-se) (Appellant)
11/10/2011LodgedAppendix (supplemental) pro-se) (Appellant)
12/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant), DENY motion for leave to file supplemental brief & appendix
12/09/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/22/2011FiledReceived - order dated 12/9/2011 sent to appellee returned from post office. sent to file room. (Appellee)
01/13/2012FiledOrder directing motion & brief (Appellee)
03/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/08/2012FiledMotion To Strike appellant's filing (Appellee)Denied
03/29/2012FiledOrder Denying Motion To Strike appellant's filing (Appellee) & Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) - 4/17/12
04/27/2012FiledOrder directing motion & brief (Appellee)
05/14/2012FiledReceived from post office 4/7/12 order sent to appellee. marked does not live here. sent to file room. (Appellee)
05/24/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte - schedule before merits
05/24/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/14/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
10/02/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/30/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, McLeese, Steadman
02/21/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Thompson and McLeese, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
03/18/2013FiledMandate