judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVE B. GLENN v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation

Case Heading (S-10-0197)
Case Number:S-10-0197Case Docketed On:09/15/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:STEVE B. GLENN v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Full Title:STEVE B. GLENN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteve B. GlennFrederick J. Harrison
Robert T. Moxley
AppelleeUnion Pacific Railroad CompanyMark C. Hansen
George E. Lemich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Evidence, Negligence, Trial - Jury Instructions
Opinion Number:2011 WY 126
Citation:262 P.3d 177

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/15/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/15/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/28/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion Certifying Good Cause for an Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/28/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/17/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion Certifying Good Cause for a Second Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/20/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/27/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/31/2011Order - Grant - extension of time (Motion requests due date 03/14/2011, proposed order had 03/24/2011 due date, used date of motion)OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/03/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appelleeMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion Certifying Good Cause for a Ten Day Extension of Time to File Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/07/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Union Pacific Railroad CompanyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/30/2011Motion - Extension of time - otherMotionExtension of time - otherFinal
03/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion certifying good cause for an extension of time to file reply brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/31/2011Order - Denying Appellant's Request for Extension to File Reply BriefOrderDenyFinal
04/11/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Frederick J. Harrison for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mark Hansen for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/26/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, ten volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volumes V-VIII, Transcripts; Volume IX, Exhibits; Volume X, Deposition. Oversized exhibits (three sealed bags) were hand delivered by Mr. Harrison last week.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/25/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Frederick J. Harrison and Robert T. Moxley, argument by Mr. Harrison for appellant; Mark C. Hansen and George E. Lemich, argument by Mr. Hansen for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/25/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/09/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/27/2011Record - Record returned to district court (Contacted Mr. Harrison regarding return of oversized exhibits to the district court).RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/27/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2). Record signed for 9/30/11.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
11/22/2011Service - Other - Receipt of Record - oversized exhibits.ServiceOtherFinal