judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4254
B-4254
10/09/1973
Application for Writ of Error
CUSTOM LEASING, INC.
TEXAS BANK AND TRUST COMPANY OF DALLAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/05/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/07/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/09/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/09/1974Response to Motion filed
12/05/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/20/1974Opinion issued
02/06/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/06/1974Document received (See Remarks)
11/07/1973Response to Petition
10/09/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
10/09/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Bank and Trust Company of DallasRespondent
Custom Leasing, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information