judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTHEWS (CAROLYN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35004
Short Caption:MATTHEWS (CAROLYN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C160404Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-10283
11/02/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 27, 1999 and September 16, 1999. Court Reporter: James Helleso. 99-10724
11/15/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file 12 Page Fast Track Statement. 99-11211
11/16/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The twelve-page fast track statement and the appendix provisionally submitted on November 15, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. 99-11335
11/16/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11213
11/16/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-11214
11/16/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/28/99. Court Reporter: Joseph A. D'Amato. 99-11358
12/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-12335
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-07759
06/06/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-09510
06/06/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 21, 2000. 00-09510