judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FLASH GLASS & MIRROR COMPANY V. MYRON GRAY

Case Information: 11-AA-0568
Short Caption:FLASH GLASS & MIRROR COMPANY V. MYRON GRAYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES495-11Filed Date:05/03/2011

Opening Event Date:05/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/02/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerFlash Glass & Mirror CompanyN
Lisa Alexis JonesNN
RespondentMyron Gray NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/03/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
05/03/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
05/11/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim (OAG), Michael Milwee (DOES, OAH and Respondent
05/27/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Flash Glass & Mirror Co. is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
06/13/2011APPEARANCE of Lisa Alexis Jones, Esquire as counsel for petitioner
06/15/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
08/17/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
08/17/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/25/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Joint Appendix by two weeks (Petitioner)Denied as Moot
10/18/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)Granted
11/10/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)
11/10/2011FiledDismissed
12/02/2011FiledMandate