Case Information: 35005 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. BENNETT (CASSIO) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35273 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C114247 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
10/21/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
10/21/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
10/21/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). | 99-10300 | |
11/19/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from the Clark County District Attorney: 20 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule in this appeal is hereby suspended pending further order of this court. | 99-11551 | |
12/10/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 99-12452 | |
03/30/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-RR/MS/NB | 00-05104 | |
04/25/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-06692 | |
04/25/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/26/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2000. | 00-06692 |