judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALVIN WIGGINS V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Case Information: 11-AA-0569
Short Caption:ALVIN WIGGINS V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Human Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DHS59-11Filed Date:05/11/2011

Opening Event Date:05/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/24/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/09/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAlvin WigginsYPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Human ServicesN
Todd S. KimNY
Bradley A. SarnellNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/11/2011FiledPETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
05/11/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
06/03/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to May 11, 2011. It is (MORE)
06/03/2011 ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (ETW)
06/03/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & KIM
02/24/2012FiledRecord On Appeal w/ 4/5/11 hearing
02/24/2012FiledRecord Completed
03/02/2012FiledBriefing Order
04/12/2012FiledBrief (Petitioner)
04/12/2012FiledAppendix ( attached to brief) (Petitioner)
05/11/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Respondent)Granted
05/14/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//LODGED OPPO
10/15/2012FiledORDER, SS, that the CLERK SHALL FILE the LODGED OPPOSITION and GRANTING the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/15/2012FiledOpposition (Petitioner)
10/15/2012FiledAffirmed
11/09/2012FiledMandate