Events |
Event Date | Status | Description | Result |
09/15/2017 | Filed | Petition For Review | |
09/15/2017 | Filed | Filing Fee Paid | |
09/21/2017 | Filed | Service Of Petition On Agency/Bd | |
10/04/2017 | Filed | Record On Appeal | |
10/04/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record #1 ( 3/22/17, 2/8/17,4/5/17, & 3/1/7 hearing) | |
10/04/2017 | Filed | Supplemental Record#2 (3/1/17 hearing) | |
10/04/2017 | Filed | Record Completed | |
10/06/2017 | Filed | Order Directing Mediation Screening Statement | |
10/13/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Intent To Intervene (Intervenor) | |
10/13/2017 | Filed | Mediation Screening Statement (Petitioner Daniel, Petitioner Fergo, Petitioner Guasch, Petitioner Holen, Petitioner Horodyskyj, Petitioner Joseph, Petitioner Lutzker, Petitioner Narain, Petitioner Neighbors for Responsive Government, LLC, Petitioner Powers, Petitioner Rope, Petitioner Scoffier, Petitioner Sills, Petitioner Stanton, Petitioner Stone, Petitioner Thayer, Petitioner Tynan, Petitioner Wilkinson, Petitioner Wittie) | |
10/18/2017 | Filed | Referred to Mediation | |
10/19/2017 | Filed | Screened Out | |
10/19/2017 | Filed | Motion To Expedite Appeal (Petitioner Daniel, Petitioner Fergo, Petitioner Guasch, Petitioner Holen, Petitioner Horodyskyj, Petitioner Joseph, Petitioner Lutzker, Petitioner Narain, Petitioner Powers, Petitioner Rope, Petitioner Scoffier, Petitioner Sills, Petitioner Stanton, Petitioner Stone, Petitioner Thayer, Petitioner Tynan, Petitioner Wilkinson, Petitioner Wittie) | Granted |
10/20/2017 | Filed | TMC | |
11/13/2017 | Filed | ORDER GRANTING joint motion to expedite and the PFR shall be placed on March 2018 CALENDAR and F/O
Petitioner's brief and appendix shall be filed by 12/13/17
Respondent and Intervenor's briefs by 1/12/18
Petitioner's reply brief by 1/26/18 | |
12/13/2017 | Filed | Brief (Petitioner Daniel, Petitioner Fergo, Petitioner Guasch, Petitioner Holen, Petitioner Horodyskyj, Petitioner Joseph, Petitioner Lutzker, Petitioner Narain, Petitioner Neighbors for Responsive Government, LLC, Petitioner Powers, Petitioner Rope, Petitioner Scoffier, Petitioner Sills, Petitioner Stanton, Petitioner Stone, Petitioner Thayer, Petitioner Tynan, Petitioner Wilkinson, Petitioner Wittie) | |
12/13/2017 | Filed | Joint Appendix (Petitioner Daniel, Petitioner Fergo, Petitioner Guasch, Petitioner Holen, Petitioner Horodyskyj, Petitioner Joseph, Petitioner Lutzker, Petitioner Narain, Petitioner Neighbors for Responsive Government, LLC, Petitioner Powers, Petitioner Rope, Petitioner Scoffier, Petitioner Sills, Petitioner Stanton, Petitioner Stone, Petitioner Thayer, Petitioner Tynan, Petitioner Wilkinson, Petitioner Wittie, Respondent) | |
01/12/2018 | Filed | Brief (Respondent) | |
01/12/2018 | Filed | Brief (Intervenor) | |
01/12/2018 | Filed | Supplemental Appendix (Respondent) | |
01/12/2018 | Filed | Briefing Completed | |
01/26/2018 | Filed | Reply Brief (Petitioner Daniel, Petitioner Fergo, Petitioner Guasch, Petitioner Holen, Petitioner Horodyskyj, Petitioner Joseph, Petitioner Lutzker, Petitioner Narain, Petitioner Neighbors for Responsive Government, LLC, Petitioner Powers, Petitioner Rope, Petitioner Scoffier, Petitioner Sills, Petitioner Stanton, Petitioner Stone, Petitioner Thayer, Petitioner Tynan, Petitioner Wilkinson, Petitioner Wittie) | |
01/31/2018 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | |
03/29/2018 | Filed | Argued Before Chief Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge Glickman, and Senior Judge Ferren (David W. Brown, Esq.) (Richard S. Love, Esq.) (Meridith H. Moldenhauer, Esq.) | |
10/18/2018 | Filed | Affirmed (opinion) | |
11/09/2018 | Filed | Mandate | |