judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-4280
B-4280
10/31/1973
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
JODY MARTIN PARR
EMILIO DAVILA, RAUL S. SERNA, SHERIFF OF DUVAL COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/10/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
12/03/1973Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/03/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/03/1973Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/21/1973Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
11/21/1973Exhibits in case/cause filedPetitioner
11/02/1973Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
10/31/1973Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/06/1974Concurring Opinion issued.
02/06/1974Opinion issued
12/10/1973Supplemental Brief filed
12/03/1973Brief in Support of Petition
12/03/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/03/1973Brief on the Merits
11/21/1973Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/21/1973Exhibits in case/cause filed
11/12/1973Bond
11/05/1973Letter Filed
11/03/1973Affidavit filed
11/03/1973Order from Lower Court filed
11/02/1973Supplement to Petition filed
11/01/1973Document filed (see remarks)
10/31/1973Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ramkin, Kern and Martinez and Robert L. GalliganAmicus Curiae
Emilio DavilaRespondent
Raul S. Serna, Sheriff of Duval CountyRespondent
Jody Martin ParrPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information