judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL S. GELLER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0543
Short Caption:MICHAEL S. GELLER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD17298-10Filed Date:04/27/2011

Opening Event Date:04/27/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/16/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/28/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/09/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/15/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael S. Geller N
Philip Fornaci YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Ephraim Wernick YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/27/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/12/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (81pgs/Tape) 3/29/11 proc.
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (9pgs/Tape) 3/29/11 proc. (EXCERPT) w/CD
06/16/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/17/2011RECORD INDEX
06/22/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/27/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/29/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - appendix (Appellant)Granted
10/14/2011FiledOrder Granting apepllant's motion for leave to file the lodged limited appendix and directing the BE
10/14/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/14/2011FiledMotion To Remand (Appellee)Denied
11/18/2011FiledAnswer/Response - to aple's motion to remand for further factual findings (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledTMC/APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND/OPPO//BRIEF//APPENDIX//3/29/11 RT
02/28/2012FiledORDER DENYING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO REMAND and APPELLEE SHALL FILE ITS BRIEF IN 30 DAYS
03/28/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/28/2012FiledBriefing Completed
06/26/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/09/2012FiledSubmitted To Jugdes Fisher,Easterly,King
09/18/2013FiledReversed (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges; and King, Senior Judge (concurring in the result))
10/15/2013FiledMandate