judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM McGARVEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0282)
Case Number:S-11-0282Case Docketed On:12/08/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:WILLIAM McGARVEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIAM McGARVEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam Mc GarveyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/08/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/20/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/23/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/09/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/12/2012Event - Hardcopy received, Motion for second extension of time to file brief; received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/10/2012Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
04/10/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule and a courtesy copy of "Request for Setting" and "Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea" filed in trial courtEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/24/2012Order - Granting Motion to Stay BriefingOrderGrantFinal
06/29/2012Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for appellant to check status of district court motion. No decision yet, they will call the district court.EventPhone CallFinal
07/13/2012Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for appellant. They haven't heard anything from the Judge yet, they will follow up.EventPhone CallFinal
07/16/2012Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
07/17/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/17/2012Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
07/17/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal