judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIMON (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36504
Short Caption:SIMON (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123884Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/31/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-13371
08/21/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-14575
11/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 00-19515
11/17/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/20/97; 6/24/97; 7/3/97; 7/10/97; 9/4/97; 10/29/97; 12/10/97; 1/22/98; 2/5/98 and 4/3/98. To Court Reporter: Free Lance Court Reporters, Dept. XVI. 00-20226
11/29/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 29, 2000. 00-20853
12/29/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-22730
01/08/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Amended Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Appellant is indigent and exempt from paying the required deposit. Transcripts requested: 5/20/97; 6/24/97; 7/3/97; 7/10/97; 9/4/97; 10/29/97; 12/10/97; 1/22/98; 2/5/98 and 4/3/98. To Court Reporter: Kit McDonald, Dept. XVI. 01-00370
01/24/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 01-01528
02/12/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/3/97; 7/10/97; 9/4/07; 10/29/97; 12/10/97; 1/22/98; 2/5/98 and 4/3/98. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 01-02758
02/23/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request). 01-03436
03/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including March 26, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-03887
03/26/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Two additional days requested. 01-05253
03/29/2001BriefReceived Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 03/28/01. 01-05469
03/29/2001AppendixReceived Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 01-05470
04/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received on march 29, 2001. Future failure to comply with this court's orders and demonstrate sufficient cause for extensions of time may result in the imposition of sanctions. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. 01-05813
04/05/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 03/28/01. 01-05469
04/05/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 through 3. 01-05470
05/09/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-07738
05/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. It appears that all transcripts necessary for the review of this appeal have been filed with this court. If either party disagrees and feels additional transcripts are necessary for the review of this appeal, the parties shall file a transcript request form identifying the specific hearing/trial dates to be transcribed with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. 01-08830
06/08/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 45 days requested. 01-09577
06/12/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed June 8, 2001. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before July 23, 2001. 01-09809
07/23/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Seven day request. 01-12423
07/25/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 23, 2001. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before July 30, 2001. 01-12605
07/31/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 07/30/01. 01-12903
07/31/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part, and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-21184
01/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00532
01/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00532