judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION v. HENRY L. SEALE

Case: B-4279
B-4279
10/31/1973
Application for Writ of Error
NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION
HENRY L. SEALE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/13/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/14/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/31/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/30/1974Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
12/20/1973Response to Motion filed
12/13/1973Motion for Rehearing
11/14/1973Response to Petition
10/31/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/31/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Henry L. SealeRespondent
NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATIONPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information