judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DOWNS (JIMMY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36503
Short Caption:DOWNS (JIMMY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39757 , 49606 , 50121 , 50704 , 53290 , 58877
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C150891Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-13369
08/14/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-14177
08/14/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 3, 2000 and April 6, 2000. To Court Reporter: Diann Prock (Free Lance Court Reporters). 00-14178
08/18/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 3, 2000, and April 6, 2000. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 00-14522
11/16/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 24, 2000. 00-20092
12/27/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-22507
12/27/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-22508
01/29/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-01836
02/23/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: March 27, 2001. 01-03439
03/29/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-05459
03/29/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
03/29/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Appendix. 01-05515
04/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On March 29, 2001, appellant filed the reply brief in this appeal and a motion to file a supplemental appendix As NRAP 30(a)(5) permits appellant to file an appendix to the reply brief, we deny appellant's motion as moot. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall file the 'supplemental appendix' received on March 29, 2001. This court is limited in its review to materials presented before the district court and that this court will disregard any matters not properly presented when taking this matter under consideration. 01-05667
04/03/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 01-05516
07/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-11822
08/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 30, 2001, appellant Jimmy Earl Downs submitted a proper person petition for rehearing. Appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person. We direct the clerk of this court to return appellant's petition for rehearing, unfiled. The remittitur is due to issue August 6, 2001. We order the issuance of the remittitur stayed to provide appellant's counsel an opportunity to file a petition for rehearing on appellant's behalf, 15 days from the date of this order. If appellant's counsel does not file a petition for rehearing within 15 days of the date of this order, the remittitur shall issue 20 days from the date of this order. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel. 01-13061
08/02/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Jimmy Earl Downs. Returned original Proper Person Petition for Rehearing received July 30, 2001.
08/14/2001MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to file Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. 01-13774
08/14/2001Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Petition for Rehearing. 01-13776
08/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 14, 2001, appellant submitted in proper person, a "Motion For Leave To File Proper Person Petition for Rehearing." Because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we decline to grant appellant permission to file documents in proper person in this appeal. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, appellant's proper person petition for rehearing submitted on August 14, 2001. Appellant is again directed to proceed through counsel in matters related to this appeal. Fn1[Although we decline to grant appellant permission to file any additional proper person documents with this court, we direct the clerk to file the August 14, 2001, motion as we have resolved that motion on its merits in this order.] 01-14171
08/21/2001MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to file Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. 01-13774
08/21/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. Petition for Rehearing. 01-13776
08/22/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-14196
08/22/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/30/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2001. 01-14196
02/22/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 22, 2001, the remittitur was issued and this case was closed. On January 29, 2002, appellant filed a proper person motion to recall the remittitur. Once again, because appellant is represented by counsel in this appeal, we decline to grant appellant permission to file papers in proper person. See NRAP 46(b). Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proper person motion received on January 29, 2002. Further, in light of this and previous order addressing appellant's numerous proper person filings, we direct the clerk of this order court to return, unfiled, any future proper person documents submitted in this appeal. 02-03392
02/22/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Jimmy Earl Downs. Returned unfiled, the Original Proper Person Motion to Recall Remittitur received January 28, 2002.
03/05/2002Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter, proper person "Memorandum in Support of Motion to Recall Remittitur and Petition for Rehearing."
03/21/2002MotionFiled Motion. Withdraw as counsel for appellant. 02-05039
08/29/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On august 21, 2001, the remittitur issued and this court's jurisdiction over this appeal ceased. On March 21, 2002, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this appeal. The clerk of this court shall amend the docket of this appeal accordingly. Because the remittitur has issued, no further action need be taken in this appeal. 02-14960