judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DE'ANDRE J. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0526
Short Caption:DE'ANDRE J. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL3818-01Filed Date:04/26/2011

Opening Event Date:04/26/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/02/2012
Argued/Submitted:01/09/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/08/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDeandre J. WilliamsYPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
David B. GoodhandYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/26/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/12/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Peter Meyers, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/12/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Peter Meyers, Esquire
05/19/2011FiledSTATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RTordered/needed (pii))
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (112 pgs/Sargent-Burns) 1/3/06 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (8 pgs/tape) 7/1/09 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (13 pgs/Hunt) 12/7/09 proc
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (12 pgs/Allison) 1/27/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (8 pgs/Ransom-Jones) 9/17/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (223 pgs/White) 10/4/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (159 pgs/White) 10/5/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (164 pgs/White ) 10/6/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (192 pgs/White) 10/7/10 proc
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (125 pgs/Ramsos) 10/12/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (196 pgs/Ramos) 10/13/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #12 (229 pgs/Shelton) 10/18-19/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (38 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/20-21/10 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (23 pgs/Shelton) 1/28/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #15 (10 pgs/Davis) 2/4/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #16 (23 pgs/Janifer) 3/29/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #17 (24 pgs/Johnson) 4/18/11 proc.
09/14/2011FiledRecord Copies
09/14/2011FiledRecord Index
09/14/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/05/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/01/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until January 16, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
11/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 1/16/12.
01/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until March 16, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
01/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/16/12.
03/16/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/16/2012FiledMotion to change case caption. (Appellant)Granted
03/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion to change case caption. (Appellant) and Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 4/25/12
04/05/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
04/05/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
05/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
05/15/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 7/9/12
06/01/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #18 (23 pgs/tape) 5/6/05 proc.
06/01/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #19 (4 pgs/tape) 6/10/05 proc.
06/01/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #20 (8 pgs/Gilliam) 11/18/05 proc.
06/01/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #21 (8 pgs/Kaczorowki) 12/19/05 proc. w/cd
07/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/17/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 8/8/12
08/02/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/02/2012FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
08/15/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
10/09/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
12/03/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/05/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
12/11/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to supplement the record.
01/09/2013FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Beckwith, Peter H. Meyers, Esq. for appellant David B. Goodhand, Esq. for appellee
01/11/2013FiledSupplemental Record - #22 (Transcript of 10/23/07 pg. 216 - pg. 252 , testimony of Ms. Angelyn Lucille Whitehurst
10/10/2013FiledVacated In Part/Affirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, and Beckwith, Associate Judges.)
10/15/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
12/17/2013FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
01/08/2014FiledMandate
02/28/2014FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
03/11/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)