judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHAWN OSBORNE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0281)
Case Number:S-11-0281Case Docketed On:12/08/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:SHAWN OSBORNE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SHAWN OSBORNE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShawn OsborneDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
Kyle A. Ridgeway

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Evidence
Opinion Number:2012 WY 123
Citation:285 P.3d 248 (Wyo. 2012)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/08/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/08/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/20/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/23/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/12/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/13/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for second extension of time to file brief; and proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/13/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/20/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on apepal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
05/07/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/08/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of certification regarding designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/08/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and Approval for Stewart M. Young, Joshua Beau Taylor and Kyle A. RidgewayEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from David E. Westling obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/29/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/04/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Documents.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/04/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Kyle A. Ridgeway obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/21/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Kite and Justices Golden, Hill, Voigt and Burke (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for Appellant; David L. Delicath, Deputy Attorney General and Kyle A. Ridgeway, Student Intern; argument by Mr. Ridgeway for Appellee) and taken under advisement.Notice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/13/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court, Justice Voigt filed a specially concurring opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/01/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/01/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/01/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/04/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 10/3/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal