judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEAU CHRISTIAN LEFFERDINK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0201)
Case Number:S-10-0201Case Docketed On:09/17/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Morals, Decency and Family 6-4-101 - 6-4-502
Short Title:BEAU CHRISTIAN LEFFERDINK v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BEAU CHRISTIAN LEFFERDINK, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBeau Christian LefferdinkDavid Paul McCarthy
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Search Warrant
Opinion Number:2011 WY 75
Citation:250 P.3d 173

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/17/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/17/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/01/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/04/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant. Received hard copies of brief in mail. E-filing was rejected and it needs to be resubmitted and will need to file an amended certificate of service.EventPhone CallFinal
11/10/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/11/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts, Exhibit & Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/19/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David McCarthy for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David Paul McCarthy for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/03/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/19/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/19/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/19/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/23/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/20/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal