judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF HELEN ISABEL NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN I. NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN NIELSEN, Deceased: PAUL D. MATHEWSON v. THE ESTATE OF HELEN ISABEL NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN I. NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN NIELSEN, Deceased.

Case Heading (S-10-0200)
Case Number:S-10-0200Case Docketed On:09/16/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Hot Springs CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF HELEN ISABEL NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN I. NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN NIELSEN, Deceased: PAUL D. MATHEWSON v. THE ESTATE OF HELEN ISABEL NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN I. NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN NIELSEN, Deceased.
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF HELEN ISABEL NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN I. NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN NIELSEN, Deceased: PAUL D. MATHEWSON, Appellant (Objector), v. THE ESTATE OF HELEN ISABEL NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN I. NIELSEN, a/k/a HELEN NIELSEN, Deceased. Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul D. Mathewson Pro Se
AppelleeHelen Isabel NielsenEdward G. Luhm

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Civil Procedure, Jurisdiction - Appellate
Opinion Number:2011 WY 71
Citation:252 P.3d 958 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/16/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/03/2010Event - Phone Call to Appellant requesting original copy of brief, he will put into mailEventPhone CallFinal
11/03/2010Brief - Appellant - filed six copies of brief. Appellant failed to date brief or certificate of serviceBriefAppellantFinal
11/05/2010Brief - Appellant (Original Copy)BriefAppellantFinal
12/10/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/05/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/06/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/07/2011Event - Phone Call from Appellant re brief of Appellee, indicated that he did not received copy. Called Counsel for Appellee, he will mail a copy.EventPhone CallFinal
01/25/2011Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/11/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/11/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/16/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal