judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

BROWN, PRINCE JR.

Case: WR-4,389-01
WR-4,389-01
09/26/1973
1107-HC
BROWN, PRINCE JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/21/1974MISC DOCUMENT RECD
11/27/1973MOT RECONSIDER MOT
11/21/1973ORDER ISSUEDHC relief denied with written order/opinion
11/17/1973MISC DOCUMENT RECD
11/07/1973MISC DOCUMENT RECD
10/31/1973MISC DOCUMENT RECD
10/19/1973SUPP/CLERK RECORD
10/03/1973ORDER FILED
09/26/1973WRIT RECEIVED
02/07/1973MISC DOCUMENT RECD
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/21/1973STOREDWRIT STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown, Jr., PrinceApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
592