judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ENOKSEN VS. THOMAS

Case Information: 34996
Short Caption:ENOKSEN VS. THOMASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - 856023Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/29/1999 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/19/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Douglas Roman Hill--check no. 8410.
10/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10182
10/29/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/14/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-12601
01/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-00644
03/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellants have failed to respond to our order of January 14, 2000. " . . . we dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-04056
04/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05749
04/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 14, 2000. 00-05749