judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL H. S. MASON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0169)
Case Number:S-10-0169Case Docketed On:07/30/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:PAUL H. S. MASON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PAUL H. S. MASON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul H. S. MasonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/30/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/14/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/15/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/18/2010Brief - Anders (no response time)BriefAndersFinal
10/18/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/18/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
10/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California 386 U.S. (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/20/2010Event - Phone Call from Public Defender, Appellant has signed a Waiver of Appeal. Motion to Dismiss will be filed.EventPhone CallFinal
10/20/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of Appeal and Waiver of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/21/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/21/2010Record - Returned unfiled record to District Court ClerkRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
10/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/21/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/25/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/22/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal