judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL MORGAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0562
Short Caption:MICHAEL MORGAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Lead:11-CM-0562Consolidated: 11-CM-0563
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM930-10Filed Date:05/05/2011

Opening Event Date:05/05/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/30/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/08/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/31/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Morgan YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
David B. GoodhandYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/05/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/19/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nso. 11-CM-562 and 11-CM-563 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in these appeals. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court records and to enusre that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with thsi court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals have bee nrodered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the records on appeals. (By: JAC)
05/19/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (126 pgs/tape) 4/5/11 proc.
06/30/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (57 pgs/tape) 4/6/11 proc. w/cd
06/30/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/06/2011 On consideration of this court's order of May 19, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
07/07/2011RECORD INDEX (11-CM-562)
07/07/2011RECORD COPIES (11-CM-562)
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Statement Regarding Transcript (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript and directing appellant to file the brief and limited appendix within 40 days and appellee's brief within 30 days thereafter
08/12/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/12/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until October 5, 2011 (Appellant)
10/04/2011LodgedReceived pro se letter from regarding lack of assistance from court-appointed counsel and request for replacement counsel. (Appellant)
10/05/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until October 19, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
10/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix (Appellant)Granted
10/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix by 7 days or unitl November 2, 2011 (Appellant)Granted
11/02/2011FiledLetter To counsel for appellant referring the pro se letter received from appellant on October 4.
11/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motions for extensions of time to file the brief and limited appendix and the lodged brief and limited appendix and directing appellee's brief to be filed within 30 days from the date of this order
11/15/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
11/18/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CM-563)
11/18/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CM-563)
12/07/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance ***FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 2/8/12 ORDERDenied
12/08/2011FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL
12/14/2011FiledMotion For Summary Reversal ***FILED AS THE REPLY BRIEF PER 2/8/12 ORDERDenied
02/08/2012FiledORDER DENYING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE MOTION FOR AFFIRMANCE AS THE BRIEF and the MOTION FOR REVERSAL AS THE REPLY BRIEF
02/08/2012FiledBrief ***MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE FILED AS THE BRIEF (Appellee)
02/08/2012FiledReply Brief **MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL FILED AS THE BRIEF (Appellant)
02/08/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/08/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/31/2012FiledSubmitted to Glickman, Oberly, Pryor
11/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman, Oberly, Pryor)
12/10/2012FiledMandate
12/12/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate and petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellant)Denied
12/19/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE or PETITION FOR REHEARING
02/13/2013FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL the MANDATE and/or PETITION FOR REHEARING
02/19/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)