judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEAH D. BENJAMIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0204)
Case Number:S-10-0204Case Docketed On:09/21/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:LEAH D. BENJAMIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LEAH D. BENJAMIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLeah D. BenjaminDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Stewart Michael Young

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Self Defense, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 147
Citation:264 P.3d 1

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/21/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/05/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/08/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/23/2010Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
12/23/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/27/2010Event - Rejected Filing - Supplemental motion to supplement the record was accepted for filing, but the affidavits were inadvertently omitted from the filing. Deleted filing, and counsel will resubmit with attachments.EventRejected FilingFinal
12/27/2010Motion - Supplement the record - supplemental motion to supplementMotionSupplement the recordFinal
12/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal, Supplemental Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal and Designation of Record on Appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/19/2011Order - Denying Motions to Supplement RecordOrderDenyFinal
02/03/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/25/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Confidential Folders; Volume V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/07/2011Order - Oral argument scheduled - JacksonOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Notice of Designation of Special Attorney General for Limited Purpose - Stewart Young.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Designation of Special Assistant Attorney General for Limited PurposeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Terry Armitage, Deputy Attorney General, and Stewart Young, Special Assistant Attorney General, argument by Mr. Young for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/14/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/14/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/17/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2) - Record signed for 11/15/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal