Case Information: 19-CV-1232 | |||
Short Caption: | MILLICENT HODGE V. UDR, INC., ET AL. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - General Civil (CAB) |
Lead: | 19-CV-0393 | Consolidated: | 19-CV-1232 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB5135-17 | Filed Date: | 12/18/2019 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/18/2019 | Case Status: | Under Advisement |
Record Completed: | 01/10/2020 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 07/06/2020 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 12/03/2020 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant-Cross-Appellee | Millicent Hodge | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee-Cross-Appellant | Waterside Trust | N |
| ||||||
Appellee-Cross-Appellant | United Dominion Realty, L.P. | N |
| ||||||
Appellee-Cross-Appellant | UDR, Inc. | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/18/2019 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
01/10/2020 | Filed | Record Index | ||
01/10/2020 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/10/2020 | Filed | No Transcript Needed | ||
01/10/2020 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals 19-CV-393, 19-CV-1231 & 19-CV-1232; referring 1231 and 1232 to mediation | ||
01/10/2020 | Filed | Referred to Mediation | ||
01/14/2020 | Filed | Screened Out | ||
01/17/2020 | Filed | Briefing Order | ||
02/20/2020 | Struck | Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Hodge) | ||
02/20/2020 | Filed | Appendix (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Hodge) | ||
02/20/2020 | Filed | Motion For Leave to File supplemental brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Hodge) ****CONSTRUED AS MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT | Denied | |
02/20/2020 | Struck | Supplemental Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Hodge) | ||
03/12/2020 | Filed | TMC | ||
03/16/2020 | Filed | ORDER DENYING appellant's motion to file the lodged brief that exceeds the page limitations... F/O STRIKING appellant's original brief... F/O DIRECTING appellant to file a new conforming brief... | ||
05/04/2020 | Withdrawn | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee-Cross-Appellant UDR, Inc.) | Withdrawn | |
05/20/2020 | Filed | Opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Hodge) | ||
05/21/2020 | Filed | Notice of withdrawal of motion to dismiss appeal (Appellee-Cross-Appellant UDR, Inc., Appellee-Cross-Appellant United Dominion Realty, L.P., Appellee-Cross-Appellant Waterside Trust) | ||
06/01/2020 | Filed | Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Hodge) | ||
06/04/2020 | Filed | ORDER GRANTING motion to withdraw motion to dismiss... F/O DIRECTING Appt/Cross-Appellee's brief no later than July 6, 2020 | ||
07/06/2020 | Filed | Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant UDR, Inc., Appellee-Cross-Appellant United Dominion Realty Trust Inc., Appellee-Cross-Appellant Waterside Trust) | ||
07/06/2020 | Filed | Appendix (Appellee-Cross-Appellant UDR, Inc., Appellee-Cross-Appellant United Dominion Realty Trust Inc., Appellee-Cross-Appellant Waterside Trust) | ||
07/06/2020 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
07/06/2020 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee-Cross-Appellant UDR, Inc., Appellee-Cross-Appellant United Dominion Realty Trust Inc., Appellee-Cross-Appellant Waterside Trust) | Granted | |
07/27/2020 | Filed | Order Granting appelees/cross-appellants' motion to dismiss appeal no. 19-CV-1231; directing appellant's reply brief in 19-CV-393 and 19-CV-1232, if any be filed on or before 8/13/20 | ||
07/27/2020 | Filed | Reply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee Hodge) | ||
10/05/2020 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary | ||
10/30/2020 | Filed | Calendar notice sent | ||
12/03/2020 | Filed | Submitted to Associate Judge McLeese, Associate Judge Deahl, and Senior Judge Fisher |