judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ANTHONY JONES

Case Information: 11-FM-0561
Short Caption:IN RE: ANTHONY JONESClassification:Appeals - Family - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO1928-10Filed Date:04/28/2011

Opening Event Date:04/28/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/03/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/05/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Jones YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sarah J. Schall YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/28/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/31/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Raymond Rigat, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 4/22/11 6/11/10 - CPO trial 4/12/11 (rt. needed) 3/25/11 3/16/11 2/15/11 6/25/10 6/11/10 - TPO hearing
06/22/2011RECEIVED - mot for appeal transcript.
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record #1 (4-pgs/tape 6/11/10 proc.)
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record #2 (54-pgs/tape 6/25/10 proc.)
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record #3 (6-pgs/tape 3/16/11 proc.)
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record #4 7-pgs/tape 3/25/11 proc.)
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 (7-pgs/tape 4/22/11 proc.)
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record #6 (20-pgs/tape 4/22/11 proc)w/cd
07/21/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/26/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/27/2011FiledRecord Index
07/27/2011FiledRecord Copies
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
10/11/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/11/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/03/2012FiledSubmitted To Washington,Glickman,Farrell
09/13/2012FiledReversed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, glickman, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the appellant's conviction for criminal contempt is reversed.)
09/20/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
09/27/2012FiledAMENDED OPINION Reversed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, glickman, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the appellant's conviction for criminal contempt is reversed.)
10/05/2012FiledMandate