judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARRY HOFFMAN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gregory Bryan Pickett, III, Deceased v. BRIAN DARNELL, D.O., and JOHNSON COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

Case Heading (S-10-0165)
Case Number:S-10-0165Case Docketed On:07/26/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:LARRY HOFFMAN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gregory Bryan Pickett, III, Deceased v. BRIAN DARNELL, D.O., and JOHNSON COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
Full Title:LARRY HOFFMAN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Gregory Bryan Pickett, III, Deceased, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. BRIAN DARNELL, D.O., and JOHNSON COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT, Appellee (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLarry HoffmanJeffrey J. Gonda
Amanda Kay Roberts
AppelleeBrian Darnell D.O.Frank D. Neville
Scott P. Klosterman
AppelleeJohnson County Hospital DistrictBillie LM Addleman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2011 WY 65
Citation:252 P.3d 936

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/26/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Received 06/25/2010, held until Statement of Evidence approved by District Judge)Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/26/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/10/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/28/2010Brief - Appellee - Johnson County Hospital District.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/28/2010Brief - Appellee Brian Darnell, D.O.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Johnson County Hospital District; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Brian Darnell, D.O.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/04/2010Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
11/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/15/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
11/15/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Billie LM Addleman for appellee Johnson Co. Hospital District.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - motion to vacate oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Amanda K. Roberts for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/19/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Scott Klosterman for appellee Darnell.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Amanda Roberts for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Billie LM Addleman for appellee Johnson County Hospital District.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/21/2010Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to expedited docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
04/13/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/29/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/29/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal