judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONROE (DWIGHT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34993
Short Caption:MONROE (DWIGHT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34938 , 38396
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990743Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-10141
12/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-12329
12/20/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Counsel requests an extension of 60 days from the date the fast track statement was due. The motion for an extension is denied. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed within 20 days of this order. 99-12909
01/07/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-00311
01/07/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 00-00313
01/13/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-00588
06/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-09977
07/11/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-11855
07/11/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2000. 00-11855