judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

WAYNE RAMSAY v. SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER AND WADE LEWIS, M. D., JAMES BAILEY, M. D.

Case: B-4264
B-4264
10/16/1973
Application for Writ of Error
WAYNE RAMSAY
SANTA ROSA MEDICAL CENTER AND WADE LEWIS, M. D., JAMES BAILEY, M. D.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/01/1974Notice of Appeal filedPetitioner
01/06/1974Errata FiledPetitioner
12/20/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/26/1973Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
10/29/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/22/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/16/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/01/1974Notice of Appeal filed
01/17/1974Letter Filed
01/06/1974Errata Filed
12/26/1973Response to Motion filed
12/21/1973Response to Motion filed
12/20/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/26/1973Supplemental Brief filed
10/29/1973Response to Petition
10/22/1973Response to Petition
10/16/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/16/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wayne RamsayPetitioner
Santa Rosa Medical Center and Wade Lewis, M. D.Respondent
James Bailey, M. D.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information