judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WADE, III (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34992
Short Caption:WADE, III (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991134Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/19/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/19/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-10129
11/10/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate That No Request for Rough Draft Transcript is Required Pursuant to Rule 3C. 99-11099
11/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11118
11/10/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-11119
12/01/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11967
09/27/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded it is without merit " . . . we affirm appellant's conviction." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-17102
10/24/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17125
10/24/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 30, 2000. 00-17125