judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN D. BONNEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0164)
Case Number:S-10-0164Case Docketed On:07/26/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:STEVEN D. BONNEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:STEVEN D. BONNEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven W. BonneyKathleen M. Karpan
Margaret M. White
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 51
Citation:248 P.3d 637

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/26/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/26/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/27/2010Record - Other - Copy of "Motion for Modification of Record on Appeal" filed in the District CourtRecordOtherFinal
08/30/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - "Order Granting Motion for Modification of Record on Appeal" filed in District CourtRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
09/01/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other "Amended Order Granting Motion for Modification of Record on Appeal" filed in District CourtRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
09/09/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Opening Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Errata (to Opening Brief of Appellant)Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
09/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to Opening Brief with attachmentsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/15/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/01/2010Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/14/2010Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/22/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/07/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/07/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/12/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/11/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal