judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HARVEY D. WILLIAMS v. NATHAN NEVELOW, TRUSTEE

Case: B-4263
B-4263
10/16/1973
Application for Writ of Error
HARVEY D. WILLIAMS
NATHAN NEVELOW, TRUSTEE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/08/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/22/1974Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/06/1974Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
01/24/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/02/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/29/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
10/16/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/13/1974Response to Motion filed
08/08/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/24/1974Opinion issued
03/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
03/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
03/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
03/27/1974Document received (See Remarks)
02/22/1974Reply to Response
02/20/1974Response to Motion filed
02/08/1974Response to Motion filed
02/07/1974Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
02/06/1974Brief in Support of Petition
01/24/1974Motion for RehearingFiling granted
01/21/1974Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for RehearingFiling granted
11/02/1973Reply to Response
10/29/1973Response to Petition
10/16/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/16/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nathan Nevelow, TrusteeRespondent
Harvey D. WilliamsPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information