judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AD ART SIGNS VS. ROBERT BROOKS TRUST

Case Information: 35008
Short Caption:AD ART SIGNS VS. ROBERT BROOKS TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34661
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A297007Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/29/1999 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
10/21/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Smith, Larsen & Wixom--check no. 003777.
10/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10326
10/29/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/08/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Settlement Judge Segal re: Nos. 34661 and 35008. 99-11025
11/17/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-11418
01/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve a docketing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant-White and Smith firm). 00-00707
01/24/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter regarding 1/18/00 order. 00-01120
03/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[On January 24, 2000, we received a letter from respondent indicating that this appeal has been dismissed. The stipulation for dismissal was filed only in docket No. 34661, not in this appeal.] NNP99B-RR/DA/ML 00-03589
04/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-05384
04/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 18, 2000. 00-05384