judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MULE SHOE RANCH, INC. v. OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS; EDWARD L. GRANT, in his official capacity as Director of the OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS

Case Heading (S-10-0182)
Case Number:S-10-0182Case Docketed On:08/24/2010
Linked To: S-10-0181
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Public Lands (Title 36)
Short Title:MULE SHOE RANCH, INC. v. OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS; EDWARD L. GRANT, in his official capacity as Director of the OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS
Full Title:MULE SHOE RANCH, INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS; EDWARD L. GRANT, in his official capacity as Director of the OFFICE OF STATE LANDS AND INVESTMENTS, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMule Shoe Ranch, Inc.David Michael Clark
AppelleeOffice of State Lands and InvestmentsBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Bridget L. Hill
AppelleeOffice of State Lands and Investments - Director's OfficeBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Bridget L. Hill

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Public Lands
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/24/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/24/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/11/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Statement of Costs and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
11/23/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bridget Hill, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David M. Clark for Mule Shoe Ranch, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/23/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/13/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Bridget L. Hill, Assistant Attorney General for appellant Office of State Lands, et al.; David Michael Clark for appellee Mule Shoe Ranch, Inc.) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
01/13/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/19/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/05/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/05/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/05/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/09/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/6/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal