judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNNY B. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0572
Short Caption:JOHNNY B. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Lead:11-CF-0572Consolidated: 12-CO-0020
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-809-10Filed Date:05/09/2011

Opening Event Date:05/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/17/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/09/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/04/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohnny B. Williams Y
Kyle A. McGonigalYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Anne Y. ParkYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/20/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Kyle McGonigal, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/20/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Kyle McGonigal, Esquire
06/24/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED from Appellant: Johnny B. Williams # 27824016 FCI Cumberland P.O. Box 1000 Cumberland, Maryland 21501
06/24/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT
06/24/2011RECEIVED - Statement Regarding Transcript
07/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (191 pgs/Kaczorowski) 1/5/11 proc.
07/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (138 pgs/Kaczorowski) 1/6/11 proc.
07/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (24 pgs/Graybill) 1/10/11 proc.
07/07/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JJ)
07/12/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
07/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
07/21/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/21/2011FiledRecord Index
07/21/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (SEALED pleadings)
08/15/2011FiledMotion - to stay briefing pending outcome of aplt's motion to vacate conviction and dismiss indictment in Superior Court (Appellant)
09/09/2011FiledMiscellaneous -supplement to motion to stay briefing pending Sup Crt outcome. (Appellant)
09/15/2011FiledOrder holding Appellant's motion to stay in abeyance.
02/14/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals nos. 11-CF-572 and 12-CO-20 are consolidated for all purposes herein.
02/14/2012FiledBriefing Order
02/14/2012FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Kyle A. McGonigal, Esquire in appeal no. 12-CO-20. (Appellant)
02/23/2012FiledRecord Copies (12-CO-20)
02/23/2012FiledRecord Index (12-CO-20)
04/03/2012FiledOrder directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/n 20 days.
05/04/2012FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit brief andlimited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/n 15 days.
05/18/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 6/20/12.
07/10/2012FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/n 15 days.
08/22/2012FiledOrder directing counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion w/n 10 days.
09/11/2012FiledOrder counsel for appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/n 10 calendar days, or counsel shall show cause why he should not be held in contempt for failure to comply.
09/12/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/03/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/03/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/03/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) and brief of appellee due w/n 30 days.
11/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
11/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 12/18/12
12/17/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/17/2012FiledBriefing Completed
01/02/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
01/04/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/28/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
04/01/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/09/2013FiledArgued before Judges Thompson, Oberly, Josey-Herring
09/12/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Thompson and Oberly, Associate Judges; and Josey-Herring, Associate Judge, Superior Court of the District of Columbia (sitting by designation pursuant to D.C. Code Section 11-707(a) (2001)))
10/04/2013FiledMandate (11-CF-572)
10/04/2013FiledMandate (12-CO-20)