judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDRUS (KELLY) VS. STATE C/W 35041

Case Information: 35007
Short Caption:ANDRUS (KELLY) VS. STATE C/W 35041Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:35007*, 35041 Related Case(s): 35041
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P0287AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-10323
11/10/1999MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Fast Track Appeals (Nos. 35007, 35041) 99-11087
11/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11209
11/15/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 99-11210
11/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. These appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. Counsel for appellant shall file a fast track statement within 15 days of this order. Nos. 35007, 35041. 99-11908
12/07/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Nos. 35007/35041 99-12245
09/06/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On November 30, 1999, we ordered these appeals consolidated. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 35007, 35041. 00-15685
10/03/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15801
10/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 6, 2000. 00-15801