judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARCUS A. SNELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0571
Short Caption:MARCUS A. SNELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-13220-10Filed Date:05/06/2011

Opening Event Date:05/06/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:09/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/25/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/09/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarcus A. Snell YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
John L. HillYY
Chrisellen R. KolbNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/06/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/20/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Christine Pembroke, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
05/20/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Christine Pembroke, Esquire
06/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
06/20/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (127-pgs/ronan 10/28-29/10 proc.)
06/20/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (30-pgs/swaringer 11/1/10 proc.)
06/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (133-pgs/kaczorowski 11/1/10 proc)
06/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (67-pgs/gilliam 11/2/10 proc)w/cd
06/20/2011RECORD INDEX
06/20/2011RECORD COPIES
06/20/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (order J. Anderson 10/22/10, order sealing bench conference J.Anderson 10/28/10) sealed yellow envelope
07/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (12 pgs/tape) 4/12/11 proc. w/cd
07/11/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/12/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/22/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/22/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/23/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/13/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
05/04/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
07/02/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/30/2012FiledMotion To Submit Without Oral Argument (Appellant)Granted
09/06/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to submit.
09/25/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Oberly
03/28/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges.)
04/03/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
04/11/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
08/16/2013FiledOrder - ORDERED that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto. (ETW)
08/22/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition to petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellee)Granted
09/10/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file a response to appellant's petition.
09/24/2013FiledOpposition to petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)
04/07/2014FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
05/09/2014FiledMandate