judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBY L. McNEEL, Successor Trustee v. EVA D. KELLY and LEE J. KELLY, in their individual capacities

Case Heading (S-10-0180)
Case Number:S-10-0180Case Docketed On:08/16/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:ROBY L. McNEEL, Successor Trustee v. EVA D. KELLY and LEE J. KELLY, in their individual capacities
Full Title:ROBY L. McNEEL, Successor Trustee, Appellant (Defendant), v. EVA D. KELLY and LEE J. KELLY, in their individual capacities, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRoby L. McNeelHenry F. Bailey Jr.
AppelleeEva D. KellyChris Dull Edwards
AppelleeLee J. KellyChris Dull Edwards

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/16/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/20/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/20/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
09/20/2010Order - Consolidating cases and granting extension of time to file briefs (Appellants'/Appellant's Brief in S-10-0179 & S-10-0190 due 10/27/10, Appellant's Brief in Case S-10-0180 also due 10/27/10)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
09/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appelles' unopposed motion for extension of time to file briefs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' unopposed motion for joinder/consolidation with Wyoming Supreme Court cases S-10-0190 and S-10-0179.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/27/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
10/28/2010Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
11/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal