judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MERCADO (RUEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35006
Short Caption:MERCADO (RUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45584 , 74513 , 74513-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C125649Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/06/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10302
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34922, 34923, 34928, 34942, 34949, 34990, 35002, 35006. 99-11154
03/06/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 21. Mailed on 03/03/00. 00-03464
03/06/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/03/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Affirmance in Part and Reversal and Remand in Part. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED in part and REVERSED in part and REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order." fn41[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-09609
06/28/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-09691
06/28/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 2, 2002. 02-09691