State of Indiana v. James B Chadwell | § § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B | Male | |||||
264 W 9th St Peru, IN 46970 | |||||||
Probation Department | Miami County Probation Department | ||||||
25 Court Street Peru, IN 46970 | |||||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | Courtney Brianne Alwine
| |||||
Charges: Chadwell, James B | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | 9-30-5-2(a) & (b)/MA: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated Endangering a Person | 000122305825 | 9-30-5-2(a) & (b) | Misdemeanor Class A | 09/15/2019 |
2. | 9-26-1-1.1(a)(4)/MB: Leaving the Scene of an Accident Def. crashes into an unattended car or other | 9-26-1-1.1(a)(4) | Misdemeanor Class B | 09/15/2019 | |
3. | 9-26-1-1.1(a)(4)/MB: Leaving the Scene of an Accident Def. crashes into an unattended car or other | 9-26-1-1.1(a)(4) | Misdemeanor Class B | 09/15/2019 | |
4. | 9-30-5-2(a)/MC: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated | 9-30-5-2(a) | Misdemeanor Class C | 09/15/2019 | |
Bonds | |||||||||||||||
|
10/28/2019 | Case Opened as a New Filing | |||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/28/2019 | Case Filed Electronically Added By EFile Manager | |||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Information Filed Information
| |||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Admin. Rule 9 form - Filed with Court Clerk
| |||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Appearance Filed Appearance
| |||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Probable Cause Affidavit Filed Probable Cause
| |||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Traffic Citation Filed Ticket
| |||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Issued | |||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Order Issuing Warrant for Arrest $900.00 cash only
| |||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 at 8:45 AM. | |||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Initial Hearing (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | |||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 10/28/2019 : James B Chadwell | |||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 10/28/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Indigent Counsel Appointed at County Expense | |||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) Defendant appears. State appears by counsel. Defendant is advised of rights and requests counsel. Public Defender appointed. Not guilty plea entered. Cause set for pre-trial on December 17, 2019 at 11:00 a.m.
| |||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Pretrial Conference scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 11:00 AM. | |||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Served | |||||||||||||
10/30/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 10/29/2019 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 10/29/2019 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
10/30/2019 | Appearance Filed Appearance Elizabeth Price
| |||||||||||||
10/30/2019 | Discovery Filed Discovery Sheet
| |||||||||||||
11/01/2019 | Written Advisement and Waiver of Rights Filed
| |||||||||||||
11/04/2019 | Hearing Journal Entry Comes now the Court and vacates its entry of 10/28/19 as the warrant in this matter was served upon the wrong defendant. The Court further vacates all hearings scheduled and vacates the appointment of pauper counsel.
| |||||||||||||
11/04/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Pretrial Conference scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 11:00 AM was cancelled. Reason: Other. | |||||||||||||
11/04/2019 | Motion Filed Request for Reissuance of Warrant
| |||||||||||||
11/05/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 11/4/2019 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 11/4/2019 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
11/15/2019 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Issued | |||||||||||||
11/21/2019 | Warrant or Writ of Attmnt for the Body of a Person Served | |||||||||||||
11/21/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 at 4:00 PM. | |||||||||||||
11/21/2019 | Bond Form Filed Defendant was released on $600 cash bond to appear for hearing on 12/3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
| |||||||||||||
11/21/2019 | Cash Bond Entered in Clerk's Office | |||||||||||||
11/22/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 11/21/2019 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
12/03/2019 | Hearing (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | |||||||||||||
12/03/2019 | Indigent Counsel Appointed at County Expense | |||||||||||||
12/03/2019 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) Defendant appears. State appears by counsel. Defendant is advised of rights and requests counsel. Public Defender appointed. Not guilty plea entered. Cause set for pre-trial on January 15, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. and trial on January 28, 2020 at 1:15 p.m.
| |||||||||||||
12/04/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Pretrial Conference scheduled for 01/15/2020 at 8:30 AM. | |||||||||||||
12/04/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Bench Trial scheduled for 01/28/2020 at 1:15 PM. | |||||||||||||
12/05/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 12/4/2019 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 12/4/2019 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
12/05/2019 | Written Advisement and Waiver of Rights Filed
| |||||||||||||
12/17/2019 | CANCELED Pretrial Conference (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) Other | |||||||||||||
01/15/2020 | Pretrial Conference (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | |||||||||||||
01/15/2020 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) Pre-trial held.
| |||||||||||||
01/16/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 1/15/2020 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | |||||||||||||
01/28/2020 | Bench Trial (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | |||||||||||||
01/29/2020 | Conditions of Probation | |||||||||||||
02/03/2020 | Judgment (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David) 1. 9-30-5-2(a) & (b)/MA: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated Endangering a Person Plea by Agreement 2. 9-26-1-1.1(a)(4)/MB: Leaving the Scene of an Accident Def. crashes into an unattended car or otherDismissed 3. 9-26-1-1.1(a)(4)/MB: Leaving the Scene of an Accident Def. crashes into an unattended car or otherDismissed 4. 9-30-5-2(a)/MC: Operating a Vehicle While IntoxicatedDismissed | |||||||||||||
02/03/2020 | Sentenced (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David) 1. 9-30-5-2(a) & (b)/MA: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated Endangering a Person
| |||||||||||||
02/03/2020 | ZNT - An Electronic SR16 has been sent to the BMV Ticket Substitute SR16 sent to BMV for Charge 1 for Statute 9-30-5-2(a) & (b) | |||||||||||||
02/04/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Sentenced ---- 2/3/2020 : Elizabeth Graham Price;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52D01-1910-CM-000799 | Chadwell, James B | 10/28/2019 Miami Superior Court 1 | CM - Criminal Misdemeanor Decided |
|