State of Indiana v. James Chadwell | § § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James | Male White 5' 7", 165 lbs | |||||
264 W 9TH ST PERU, IN 46970 | |||||||
Probation Department | Miami County Probation Department | ||||||
25 Court Street Peru, IN 46970 | |||||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | Courtney Brianne Alwine
| |||||
Charges: Chadwell, James | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | 9-30-5-2(a)/F6: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated: Prior Conviction | 000122862090 | 9-30-5-2(a) | Felony 6 | 10/26/2019 |
2. | 35-44.1-3-1(a)(1)/MA: Resisting Law Enforcement def. knowingly or intentionally forcibly resists, o | 35-44.1-3-1(a)(1) | Misdemeanor Class A | 10/26/2019 | |
3. | 9-30-5-2(a) & (b)/MA: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated Endangering a Person | 9-30-5-2(a) & (b) | Misdemeanor Class A | 10/26/2019 | |
4. | 9-30-5-2(a)/MC: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated | 9-30-5-2(a) | Misdemeanor Class C | 10/26/2019 | |
10/28/2019 | Case Opened as a New Filing | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/28/2019 | Case Filed Electronically Added By EFile Manager | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Information Filed Information
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Information Filed Prior Conviction - OWI (5 years)
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Appearance Filed Appearance
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information Admin. Rule 9 form - Filed with Court Clerk
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Probable Cause Affidavit Filed PC
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Probable Cause Affidavit Filed Affidavit for Probable Cause-OWI
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Traffic Citation Filed Ticket
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/28/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 at 8:45 AM. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Initial Hearing (8:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 10/28/2019 : James Chadwell | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 10/28/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Indigent Counsel Appointed at County Expense | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) Defendant appears. State appears by counsel. Defendant is advised of rights and requests counsel. Public Defender appointed. Not guilty plea entered. Cause set for pre-trial and omnibus date on December 17, 2019 t 11:00 a.m.
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/29/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Pretrial Conference scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 11:00 AM. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/30/2019 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 10/29/2019 : James Chadwell Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 10/29/2019 : James Chadwell | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/30/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 10/29/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 10/29/2019 : Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/30/2019 | Probable Cause Affidavit Filed Approved PC signed by Judge Grund.
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/30/2019 | Probable Cause: Refused with Immediate Suspension
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
10/30/2019 | PCZNT - An Electronic PC Affidavit was created in INcite Probable cause affidavit sent to BMV | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
11/01/2019 | Written Advisement and Waiver of Rights Filed
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
11/13/2019 | Discovery Filed Discovery Sheet
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
11/14/2019 | Appearance Filed Appearance
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/17/2019 | Pretrial Conference (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/17/2019 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) On motion of defendant the Court continues this matter to February 4, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. Defendant released on his own recognizance.
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/17/2019 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Pretrial Conference scheduled for 02/04/2020 at 11:00 AM. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/18/2019 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 12/17/2019 : Kristina L Lynn;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 12/17/2019 : Kristina L Lynn;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
12/18/2019 | Personal Recognizance Bond Entered in Clerk's Office Defendant to appear for hearing on 2/4/20 at 11:00 a.m. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/04/2020 | Pretrial Conference (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/04/2020 | Hearing Journal Entry (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) On motion of defendant the Court sets this matter for change of plea and sentencing on February 18, 2020 at 9:00 a.m.
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/04/2020 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Change of Plea Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2020 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/05/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Journal Entry ---- 2/4/2020 : Kristina L Lynn;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 2/4/2020 : Kristina L Lynn;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/11/2020 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Change of Plea Hearing scheduled for 02/18/2020 at 9:00 AM was cancelled. Reason: Agreement of Parties. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/11/2020 | Change of Plea Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/11/2020 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Change of Plea Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2020 at 9:00 AM. | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/11/2020 | Order Granting Mot. to Enter Plea Pursuant to Plea Agreement (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David ) Order Granting Motion to Enter Plea of Guilty Pursuant to Plea Agreement.
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/11/2020 | Conditions of Probation
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/12/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 2/11/2020 : Kristina L Lynn;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 2/11/2020 : Kristina L Lynn;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics Order Granting Mot. to Enter Plea Pursuant to Plea Agreement ---- 2/11/2020 : Kristina L Lynn;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/18/2020 | CANCELED Change of Plea Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) Agreement of Parties | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/18/2020 | Court Requests Suspension of Driver for OWI Vol./Book 1, Page Year | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/18/2020 | Judgment (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David) 1. 9-30-5-2(a)/F6: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated: Prior Conviction Plea by Agreement 2. 35-44.1-3-1(a)(1)/MA: Resisting Law Enforcement def. knowingly or intentionally forcibly resists, oPlea by Agreement 3. 9-30-5-2(a) & (b)/MA: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated Endangering a PersonDismissed 4. 9-30-5-2(a)/MC: Operating a Vehicle While IntoxicatedDismissed | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/18/2020 | Sentenced (Judicial Officer: Grund, J. David) 1. 9-30-5-2(a)/F6: Operating a Vehicle While Intoxicated: Prior Conviction
| ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/18/2020 | ZNT - An Electronic SR16 has been sent to the BMV Ticket Substitute SR16 sent to BMV for Charge 1 for Statute 9-30-5-2(a) | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/18/2020 | Disposition Sent Electronically to Indiana State Police Added By CHRIS Interface (SNTC) | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
02/19/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Sentenced ---- 2/18/2020 : Kristina L Lynn;Miami County Probation Department;Courtney Brianne Alwine;Jeffrey Kent Sinkovics | ||||||||||||||||||||||||
03/03/2020 | Abstract of Judgment Sent to DOC |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
52D01-1910-F6-000369 | Chadwell, James | 10/28/2019 Miami Superior Court 1 | F6 - Felony 6 Decided |
|