judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEYERS (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34998
Short Caption:MEYERS (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9900687CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/05/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-10246
10/25/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. September 27, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. 99-10459
10/27/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 9, 1999. Court Reporter: Christy Hamrey. 99-10537
11/18/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-11493
12/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-12330
12/17/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Respondent shall have to and including January 7, 2000, to file the fast track response. 99-12775
01/07/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-00316
05/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-07636
06/19/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 19, 2000. 00-10456
07/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second request.) 00-12476
07/20/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before August 18, 2000. 00-12579
08/18/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third request) 00-14464
08/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Brief due: September 18, 2000. 00-14763
09/18/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 9/18/00. 00-16464
10/17/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: November 16, 2000. 00-18425
11/16/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 11/16/00. 00-20170
12/14/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: January 16, 2001. 00-21875
01/16/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-00975
01/19/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant's reply brief shall be served and filed on or before February 15, 2001. 01-01224
02/15/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (third request) 01-03022
02/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion requesting a third extension of time, to and including March 19, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief. We admonish appellant's counsel, however, that the court disapproves of repeated requests for extensions of time to brief appeals in criminal cases. Consequently, no futher extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-03406
03/19/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 03/19/01. 01-04863
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-14964
09/05/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
11/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the district court's decision AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-18886
12/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19482
12/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 12, 2001. 01-19482