judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STRONG CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. CITY OF TORRINGTON

Case Heading (S-10-0171)
Case Number:S-10-0171Case Docketed On:08/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:STRONG CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. CITY OF TORRINGTON
Full Title:STRONG CONSTRUCTION, INC., Appellant (Defendant), v. CITY OF TORRINGTON, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantStrong Constuction, Inc.Douglas W. Weaver
AppelleeCity of TorringtonJames A. Eddington

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Limitation of Actions, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2011 WY 82
Citation:255 P.3d 903

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/04/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/03/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief of Appellant; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/15/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Designation of Record and Statement of Costs of the Original Transcript Pursuant to Rule 10.01 of the Wyoming Rules of Appellate ProcedureEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/01/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, City of TorringtonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/07/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James A. Eddington for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/19/2011Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
01/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - motion to vacate oral argument setting.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2011Order - Deny - Order denying motion to vacate oral argument setting.OrderDenyFinal
01/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Douglas Weaver for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Douglas W. Weaver for appellant; James A. Eddington for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/23/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/08/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/08/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/9/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal