judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN D. ANDERSON V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0564
Short Caption:KEVIN D. ANDERSON V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF14758-10Filed Date:05/04/2011

Opening Event Date:05/04/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/15/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin D. Anderson Y
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/18/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall w/n 20 days SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for LACK OF JURISDICTION as an associate judge's review of a magistrate judge's decision is a prerequisite for appeal.. (BY: ETW)
05/18/2011TMC - OTSC - appellant's motion for counsel & to extend time to respond
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
06/23/2011 ORDERED that this appeal IS DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction... It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL IS DENIED AS MOOT. (BRNBKG)
06/23/2011DISMISSED
07/01/2011RECEIVED SR #1 (66 pgs. -- Tape) (12/16/10 proc. w/CD).
07/15/2011FiledMandate