judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BAKER VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34997
Short Caption:BAKER VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37426
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A405479Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Prohibition
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/11/2000 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/11/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/20/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
10/20/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robert P. Baker--check no. 10532.
10/20/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Prohibition. Petition for a Writ of Prohibition or Other Appropriate Writ and Request for Stay. 99-10197
10/20/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Application for Stay of District Court Proceedings. 99-10198
10/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix of Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Other Appropriate Writ and Request for Stay. 99-10199
10/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. We temporarily stay all district court proceedings related to this matter pending our receipt and consideration on an opposition to petitioner's request for a stay. The real party in interest may, within 10 days of this order, file and serve any opposition to petitioner's request for a stay. 99-10266
11/12/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Other Appropriate Writ and Request for Stay. 99-11155
11/19/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Other Approprate Writ and Request for Stay. 99-11563
11/23/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Motion and Reply filed/received on 11/19/99. 99-11710
12/03/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or other Appropriate Writ and Request for Stay 99-12079
12/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk is directed to file the reply received on November 19, 1999. 99-12668
12/15/1999Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Prohibition or Other Appropriate Writ and Request for Stay. 99-11564
02/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for April 11, 2000, at the hour of 8:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Carson City. (NNP99B-RR/DA/ML) 00-03059
03/29/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 00-05095
04/11/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. NNP99B-RR/DA/ML
06/05/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition denied." We granted Baker's request for a temporary stay on October 21, 1999. We now address the merits of Baker's writ petition. Before Rose, C.J., Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 62. NNP99B-RR/DA/ML 00-09350
07/03/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-11203
07/03/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.