judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEVADA AUTOMOBILE NETWORK VS. GUY

Case Information: 36515
Short Caption:NEVADA AUTOMOBILE NETWORK VS. GUYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A392623
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A417589
Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/08/2000 / Mendoza, JohnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/04/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from J. Michael McGroarty, Chartered--check no. 17412.
08/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. 00-13490
08/03/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger.
08/08/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: John F. Mendoza. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. With Prejudice as to respondents Federated Insurance Company and Billy Ray Sims, only. 00-15609
09/13/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Application for Stay pursuant to NRAP 8. 00-16105
09/13/2000Other Other. Filed Exhibits in Support of Application for Stay. (Received original only.) 00-16109
09/20/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed as to respondents Federated Insurance and Billy Ray Sims only." The parties shall bear their own costs. The clerk of this court shall remove Federated Insurance and Billy Ray Sims as respondents from the caption of this court's docket. 00-16572
09/25/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent Guy's Opposition to Application for Stay. 00-16829
10/03/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Returned, with letter (pursuant to NRAP 27(a)), Reply to Opposition to Application for Stay pursuant to NRAP 8.
10/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 17, 2000. 00-17914
10/12/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Application for Stay Pursuant to NRAP 8. 00-18074
10/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Motion for Stay. This is a motion for a stay pending appeal of a June 2000 district court judgment and order. Respondent opposes the motion. The documents submitted by the parties demonstrate there is nothing to be preserved by a stay. We deny appellant's motion. 00-18399
11/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On October 17, 2000, we denied appellant's motion for a stay. On October 12, 2000, appellant filed a motion for leave to file a reply to respondent Guy's opposition. We deny the motion, which is moot, and we direct the court clerk to return unfiled the reply submitted provisionally with appellant's motion. 00-19183
11/01/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney J. Michael McGroarty: returned unfiled, the original Reply to Opposition to Application for Stay pursuant to NRAP 8 received on October 12, 2000.
11/15/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-20060
11/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
11/21/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-20454
11/30/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-20911
12/08/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 25, 2000. To Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 00-21503
01/29/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 25, 2000. Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin. 01-01867
03/21/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule. 01-04978
03/23/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before April 20, 2001. 01-05117
04/30/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. 01-07188
05/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We elect to treat the stipulation filed on April 30, 2001, as a joint motion for an extension of time. Appellant shall have to and including May 20, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We caution counsel that failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional requests for extension of time to the file the opening brief and appendix may result in the denial of the motion. 01-07344
05/16/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-08108
05/22/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 05/22/01. (Appendix previously filed.) 01-08586
06/13/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 06/11/01. 01-09888
07/16/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 07/12/01. 01-11956
12/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-20263
12/04/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions, we 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-21201
01/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00539
01/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00539