judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DENNIS JAY GROSS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0296)
Case Number:S-11-0296Case Docketed On:12/27/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903
Short Title:DENNIS JAY GROSS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DENNIS JAY GROSS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDennis Jay Gross Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
David L. Delicath
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 93
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/27/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/03/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/06/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/06/2012Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/27/2012Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
03/27/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/27/2012Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/27/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967), Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro se BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/27/2012Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
04/24/2012Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
06/12/2012Brief - Failure to file - appellant (Anders)BriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
06/27/2012Opinion - Published orderOpinionPublished orderFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/13/2012Record - Returned unfiled recordRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
07/13/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/13/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal