judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TAYLOR A/K/A CALLAWAY VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36516
Short Caption:TAYLOR A/K/A CALLAWAY VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C164608Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-13491
10/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the State, on behalf of respondents: 20 days from the date of this order. Petitioner shall have 20 days from the date of this order to supplement the petition with a copy of the grand jury transcript. 00-17491
10/11/2000Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Supplement to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-17951
10/23/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer Against Issuance of Requested Writ. 00-18699
10/24/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The real party in interest's answer to the petition for writ of mandamus shall be served and filed on or before November 22, 2000. 00-18798
11/28/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Mailed on November 22, 2000. 00-20745
03/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn3[In addition, we decline to consider petitioner's arguments to the extent they challenge the finding of probable cause and the corpus delicti.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-05321
04/24/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-05338
04/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.