judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUCAS KAPTUE V. SOK C. REED

Case Information: 11-CV-0558
Short Caption:LUCAS KAPTUE V. SOK C. REEDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB2429-11Filed Date:04/19/2011

Opening Event Date:04/19/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/29/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLucas Kaptue NPro SeN
AppelleeSok C. Reed NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/19/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/07/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 19, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
07/07/2011 On consideration of this court's order of June 7, 2011, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 20 days, and it it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
07/07/2011DISMISSED
07/29/2011FiledMandate