judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: DAWN M. SCHOSSOW v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0183)
Case Number:S-10-0183Case Docketed On:08/24/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: DAWN M. SCHOSSOW v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: DAWN M. SCHOSSOW, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDawn M. SchossowHampton McCracken Young Jr.
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
Kelly Roseberry

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 111
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/24/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/24/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/24/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/04/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file principal brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/11/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/09/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant. Advised that Court received the hard copies in the mail today and were one short and that the brief had been rejected and needed to be resubmitted.EventPhone CallFinal
11/09/2010Brief - Appellant (Certificate of Service date taken from hard copies of brief.BriefAppellantFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in trial courtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/27/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee/Respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/19/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
07/15/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/02/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/02/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/04/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/3/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal